Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date 7/1/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 405.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, Henry, and Zeringue.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, LaFleur, and Allain.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|