Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Effective date 6/23/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 375.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|