House | 05/31/2017 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Reported without action (11-0), with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |