Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Effective date 6/14/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 256.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 133. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|