House | 05/09/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |