LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB48
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2017 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB48
Action History
Senate
04/19/2017
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
04/18/2017
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
04/17/2017
Reported favorably.
Senate
04/10/2017
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Senate
03/24/2017
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.