House | 05/15/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |