House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended, reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 33. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|