Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 22 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |