Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Berthelot, and Hensgens.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Perry, Peterson, and Donahue.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|