Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date 6/12/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 105.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably (7-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|