LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR111
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR111
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2017 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR111
Action History
House
06/01/2017
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
House
06/01/2017
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
05/31/2017
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
Senate
05/30/2017
Reported with amendments.
Senate
05/24/2017
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Senate
05/23/2017
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.