Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|