Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|