Senate | 06/05/2017 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 78 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17. | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably (6-0). | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |