Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Mack, Hodges, and Marcelle.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Claitor, and Lambert.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|