Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|