Senate | 06/08/2017 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/01/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |