Senate | 06/05/2017 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/26/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |