Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|