Senate | 05/30/2017 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Approved on 5/24/2017. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/22/2017. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Received on 5/8/2017. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2017 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/28/2017. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/27/2017. |