Senate | 05/24/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for May 17, 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |