Senate | 06/05/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |