Senate | 06/05/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |