LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR89
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR89
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2017 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR89
Action History
Senate
05/15/2017
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Senate
05/10/2017
Read by title and adopted.
Senate
05/10/2017
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
Senate
05/09/2017
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
05/08/2017
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.