House | 03/04/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/05/18. | ||
House | 03/04/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 03/04/2018 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/18. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Reported with amendments (10-7-1). | ||
House | 02/19/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/16/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/16/2018 | Prefiled. |