Senate | 03/05/2018 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018. | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2018 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 02/19/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 02/19/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |