House
|
06/12/2018
|
Effective date: 6/12/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|