Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 38, nays 66. The Conference Committee Report, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was rejected.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Morrell, and LaFleur.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Lance Harris, Abramson, and Dwight.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 5. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 28. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 38. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Reported with amendments (11-6-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|