House
|
06/12/2018
|
Effective date: 6/12/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/6/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 2. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|