House | 06/04/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2018 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/03/2018 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2018 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/01/2018 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 79, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/31/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/18. | ||
House | 05/31/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |