Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Effective date 6/12/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Reported favorably (12-7). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2018
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|