LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2018 2nd Special Session
Senate
Bills
SB6
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2018 2nd Special Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB6
Action History
House
06/01/2018
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
House
05/31/2018
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Senate
05/30/2018
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Senate
05/29/2018
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
05/22/2018
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.