Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Chabert, and Hewitt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2018
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|