House
|
06/25/2018
|
Effective date: 7/1/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2018
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Reported with amendments (18-4).
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|