House
|
06/24/2018
|
Effective date: 7/1/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2018
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2018
|
Reported with amendments (12-5).
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|