House | 06/24/2018 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 06/24/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/24/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/22/2018 | Notice removed | ||
House | 06/21/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18. | ||
House | 06/21/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 06/21/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | ||
House | 06/18/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/18/2018 | Prefiled. |