House | 06/27/2018 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2018 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/25/2018. | ||
House | 06/24/2018 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/24/2018 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2018 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/21/2018 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/20/2018 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 06/18/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |