Senate | 03/27/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18. | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Reported with amendments (7-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/26/2018 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018. | ||
House | 01/24/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/24/2018 | Prefiled. |