Senate | 03/21/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Prefiled. |