House
|
05/30/2018
|
Effective date: 07/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 613.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2018
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|