Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 24 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|