Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/25/2018 | Prefiled. |