Senate | 04/09/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/26/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/26/2018 | Prefiled. |