Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported with amendments (13-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Reported favorably (11-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|