House
|
05/15/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 296.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2018
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|