Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-7).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|