House
|
05/10/2018
|
Effective date: 08/01/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 67.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|