House | 04/24/2018 | Notice removed | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/18. | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Reported favorably (8-4). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Prefiled. |