Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 6 yeas and 29 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|